Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Workers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0056
Title
Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0118 /CH0554
Title
Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0173
Title
State Board of Social Work Examiners - Temporary License to Practice Social Work
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0512 /CH0210
Title
Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Composition and Regulations
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0657
Title
Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0833 (SB0768)
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsor
Delegate Lierman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0916
Title
Higher Education - Programs for Behavioral Health Professionals in Primary and Secondary Schools - Requirements and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1177
Title
Courts - Expert Witnesses - Licensed Certified Social Workers-Clinical
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1231
Title
Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562)
Title
Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Health Occupations - Mental Health Services - Cultural Competency and Diversity
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0843)
Title
Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1407 (SB0336)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1467 (SB0994)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0336 (HB1407)
Title
Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0362
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031)
Title
Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0768 (HB0833)
Title
Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB1335)
Title
Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0994 (HB1467)
Title
Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0056 Commission on Student Behavioral Health and Mental Health Treatment Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
HB0118 /CH0554 Public Schools - Student Attendance - Excused Absences Delegate Washington 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 554
Ways and Means
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0173 State Board of Social Work Examiners - Temporary License to Practice Social Work Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/03 at 2:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2022 - 2:30 PM
HB0512 /CH0210 Professional Standards and Teacher Education Board - Composition and Regulations Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 210
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0657 Public Schools - Standardized Behavioral Health Questionnaire for Students - Development and Implementation Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/05/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0833 (SB0768) Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response Delegate Lierman 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator Hershey) Adopted
Judiciary
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0916 Higher Education - Programs for Behavioral Health Professionals in Primary and Secondary Schools - Requirements and Grant Program Delegate Reznik 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1164 Labor and Employment - Workers' Compensation - Licensed Certified Social Worker-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1177 Courts - Expert Witnesses - Licensed Certified Social Workers-Clinical Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1231 Public Schools - Student Health Professional Retention Program - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1255 /CH0031 (SB0705/CH0562) Education - Physical Restraint and Seclusion - Limitations, Reporting, and Training Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 31
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1318 Health Occupations - Mental Health Services - Cultural Competency and Diversity Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/03/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1335 (SB0843) Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1407 (SB0336) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1467 (SB0994) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0336 (HB1407) Family Law - Custody Evaluators - Qualifications and Training Senator Carozza 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0362 Primary and Secondary Education - Virtual Education - Requirements Senator Pinsky 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 /CH0562 (HB1255/CH0031) Education – Physical Restraint and Seclusion – Limitations, Reporting, and Training Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 562
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/02/2022 - 1:03 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0768 (HB0833) Criminal Law - Victims of Child Sex Trafficking and Human Trafficking - Safe Harbor and Service Response Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0843 (HB1335) Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0994 (HB1467) Public Health - Mental Health Advance Directives - Awareness and Statewide Database Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/22/2022 - 1:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page