Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0420 (SB0405/CH0004)
Title
Retirement Tax Elimination Act of 2022
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0787
Title
Retiree Income Tax Relief Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0990 /CH0628 (SB0694/CH0629)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995 /CH0525 (SB0920/CH0526)
Title
Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1138 (SB0809)
Title
Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1453 (SB0344)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0154
Title
Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0344 (HB1453)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0405 /CH0004 (HB0420)
Title
Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit (Retirement Tax Elimination Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0694 /CH0629 (HB0990/CH0628)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0809 (HB1138)
Title
Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0920 /CH0526 (HB0995/CH0525)
Title
Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0420 (SB0405/CH0004) Retirement Tax Elimination Act of 2022 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0787 Retiree Income Tax Relief Act of 2022 Delegate Krebs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0990 /CH0628 (SB0694/CH0629) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 628
Judiciary
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0995 /CH0525 (SB0920/CH0526) Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study Delegate Solomon 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Ways and Means
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1138 (SB0809) Homeowners' Property Tax Credit - Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Delegate Attar 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1453 (SB0344) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2022 Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0154 Advanced Practice Registered Nurse Compact Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0344 (HB1453) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2022 Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0405 /CH0004 (HB0420) Income Tax - Retirement Income Subtraction Modifications and Senior Credit (Retirement Tax Elimination Act of 2022) President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 4
Budget and Taxation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0694 /CH0629 (HB0990/CH0628) Estates and Trusts - Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons - Court-Appointed Attorneys Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 629
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0809 (HB1138) Homeowners’ Property Tax Credit – Easy Application and Automatic Renewal Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0920 /CH0526 (HB0995/CH0525) Early Childhood Development - Child Care Scholarship Program - Alterations and Study Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 526
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page