Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Social Security

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0030 /CH0607
Title
Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0733 (SB0572)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1184
Title
Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471)
Title
Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0572 (HB0733)
Title
Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0030 /CH0607 Office of People's Counsel - Alterations (Office of People's Counsel Environmental Reform Act) Delegate Korman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Economic Matters
2/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0554 /CH0471 (SB0507/CH0472) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 471
Health and Government Operations
2/03/2021 - 2:30 PM
Finance
HB0733 (SB0572) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021 Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1184 Maryland Judiciary - Personal Identifying Information - Protection Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0507 /CH0472 (HB0554/CH0471) Division of Consumer Protection - Assisted Living Programs Senator Kelley 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 472
Finance
2/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0572 (HB0733) Retirement Tax Reduction Act of 2021 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 2:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/10/2021 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:22 PM
Click to return on the top page