Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Social Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1286
Title
Social Networks - Next Generation 9-1-1 and Public Service Announcements
Sponsor
Delegate Hornberger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1410 (SB0162)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0162 (HB1410)
Title
Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072)
Title
Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0851
Title
Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies
Sponsor
Senator Carter
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0279 /CH0072 (SB0654/CH0073) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 72
Health and Government Operations
2/08/2022 - 3:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1286 Social Networks - Next Generation 9-1-1 and Public Service Announcements Delegate Hornberger 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/08/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1368 Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1410 (SB0162) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0162 (HB1410) Public Schools – Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course – Development, Implementation, and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0654 /CH0073 (HB0279/CH0072) Veterans Affairs - Communications, Outreach, and Advocacy Program - Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 73
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/29/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0851 Labor and Employment - User Name and Password Privacy - Law Enforcement Agencies Senator Carter 4 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Finance
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 1:52 PM
Click to return on the top page