Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Social Media

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0057
Title
Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0131
Title
Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824 (SB0231)
Title
Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1037
Title
Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1314
Title
Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1358 (SB0948)
Title
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0231 (HB0824)
Title
Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0346
Title
Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings
Sponsor
Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0948 (HB1358)
Title
Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
5 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0057 Voters' Rights Protection Act of 2020 Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0131 Correctional Services – Step–Down Programs – Cause of Action Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0824 (SB0231) Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting Delegate Young, P. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1037 Election Law - Websites - Reporting of Political Censorship Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1314 Business Regulation – Social Media Websites – Censored Speech Delegate Adams 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1358 (SB0948) Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Health and Government Operations
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0231 (HB0824) Public Schools - Cyber Safety Guide and Training Course - Development, Implementation, and Reporting Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0346 Department of Natural Resources - Public Notices and Hearings Chair, Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/14/2021 - 2:00 PM
SB0948 (HB1358) Veterans Affairs – Office of Communications and Public Affairs – Veterans Advocacy and Education Act Senator Klausmeier 5 2 In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 3:43 PM
Click to return on the top page