Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Smoking and Vaping -see also- Cannabis; Cigarettes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0134 (SB0177)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 /CH0767 (SB0883/CH0768)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0177 (HB0134)
Title
Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273
Title
Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0378
Title
Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0708
Title
Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0134 (SB0177) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB1324 /CH0767 (SB0883/CH0768) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 767
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
SB0177 (HB0134) Business Regulation - Flavored Tobacco Products - Prohibition Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0273 Electronic Smoking Device Regulation Act of 2021 Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/28/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0378 Baltimore City - Cigarettes, Other Tobacco Products, and Electronic Smoking Devices - Local Laws Authorization Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/11/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0708 Cannabis – Legalization and Regulation Senator Feldman 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/04/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page