Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Small Claims

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0349 (SB0452)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0452 (HB0349)
Title
Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0349 (SB0452) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition Delegate Moon 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0452 (HB0349) Small Claims - Examination in Aid of Enforcement and Interrogatories in Aid of Execution - Prohibition Senator Smith 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/31/2022 5:12 PM
Click to return on the top page