Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Sidewalks

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0487
Title
Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0387
Title
Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0487 Education – School Construction – Pedestrian Safety Plans (School Pedestrian Safety Act) Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0595 (SB0726/CH0351) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0387 Intersection of State and Local Highways – Crosswalks and Curb Ramps Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 /CH0351 (HB0595) Vehicle Laws - Personal Delivery Devices - Standards and Requirements Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 351
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/21/2021 12:31 PM
Click to return on the top page