Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sexual Orientation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0182
Title
State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0352 (SB0888)
Title
Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0355 /CH0217
Title
Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0370
Title
Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation
Sponsor
Delegate Belcastro
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0516
Title
St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0517 (SB0460)
Title
Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0850 /CH0739 (SB0666)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1256
Title
Education - Discriminatory Concepts in Instruction - Prohibition (Ending Discrimination in Public Education Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Chisholm
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1258
Title
Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1380 /CH0422
Title
General Provisions - LGBTQ Veterans - Honorable Discharge (Restoration of Honor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1457
Title
Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0011
Title
Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0116
Title
Public Schools - Inclusive and Diverse English Language Arts - Development of Content Standards and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0282
Title
Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0460 (HB0517)
Title
Health - Insurance Coverage Information
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739)
Title
Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0888 (HB0352)
Title
Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0910
Title
Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0182 State Procurement – Certification of LGBTQ Businesses Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0352 (SB0888) Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB0355 /CH0217 Prince George's County Board of Education - Workgroup, Alterations, and Orientation Requirement PG 503-22 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 217
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0370 Certificates of Birth – Issuance of New Certificates – Sex Designation Delegate Belcastro 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0426 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0516 St. Mary's County Human Relations Commission - Equal Treatment St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Special Order until 4/11 (Senator Washington) Adopted
Health and Government Operations
3/01/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0517 (SB0460) Consumer Health Access Program for Mental Health and Addiction Care - Establishment Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/23/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0850 /CH0739 (SB0666) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education - Discrimination Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 739
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1256 Education - Discriminatory Concepts in Instruction - Prohibition (Ending Discrimination in Public Education Act of 2022) Delegate Chisholm 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1258 Primary and Secondary Education – Educational Options – Established Delegate Kipke 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1380 /CH0422 General Provisions - LGBTQ Veterans - Honorable Discharge (Restoration of Honor Act) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1457 Real Estate Transactions - Prospective Buyer Communications - Personal Information Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0011 Workgroup on Online Consumer Personal Information Privacy Senator Lee 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0116 Public Schools - Inclusive and Diverse English Language Arts - Development of Content Standards and Implementation Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0282 Workgroup on Screening Related to Adverse Childhood Experiences Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0460 (HB0517) Health - Insurance Coverage Information Senator Augustine 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/07 at 12:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
4/07/2022 - 12:00 PM
SB0666 (HB0850/CH0739) Schools, Prekindergarten Programs, and County Boards of Education – Discrimination Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Favorable Report by Ways and Means
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0888 (HB0352) Education - American Studies and Social Equity Standards Advisory Board - Academic Standards and Model Policy Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0910 Nondiscrimination – Courts and Other Governmental Entities – Prohibitions, Policy, and Training (Access to Justice for All Youth) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:26 PM
Click to return on the top page