Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Sewage

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0101
Title
State Highway Projects - Removal, Relocation, and Adjustment of Utility Facilities - Notification, Work Plans, and Compliance
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0245
Title
Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation
Sponsor
Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0507 /CH0974
Title
Allegany and Garrett Counties - Property Tax - Credit for Construction of Housing
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0777 (SB0625)
Title
Baltimore City - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges - Tax Sales of Non-Owner-Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0991 /CH0531 (SB1074/CH0532)
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0992 /CH0562 (SB0835/CH0561)
Title
Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 /CH0679
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program - Expansion PG/MC 101-24
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1161 (SB1051)
Title
Dorchester County - Sanitary Commission - Transfer of Powers to County Council
Sponsor
Dorchester County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1284
Title
Wetlands and Waterways Program - Stream Restoration Projects
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1320
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Disbursement and Use of Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1404 (SB1149)
Title
Environment – Storage of Dissolved Air Flotation By–Products – Local Authority
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1512 /CH0545 (SB1173)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Adams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0096 (HB0024)
Title
Environment - Impact of Environmental Permits and State Agency Actions
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0625 (HB0777)
Title
Baltimore City – Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges – Tax Sales of Non–Owner–Occupied Residential Property
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0710
Title
Water Utilities Shutoff Protections
Sponsor
Senator Washington, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 /CH0561 (HB0992/CH0562)
Title
Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0993
Title
Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Review and Credit for Construction of Facility
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1051 (HB1161)
Title
Dorchester County – Sanitary Commission – Transfer of Powers to County Council
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531)
Title
Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1149 (HB1404)
Title
Environment - Storage of Dissolved Air Flotation By-Products - Local Authority
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1173 (HB1512/CH0545)
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0101 State Highway Projects - Removal, Relocation, and Adjustment of Utility Facilities - Notification, Work Plans, and Compliance Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 In the House - Referred to interim study by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/15/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0245 Department of the Environment - Fees, Penalties, Funding, and Regulation Chair, Environment and Transportation Committee 5 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/31/2024 - 2:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0507 /CH0974 Allegany and Garrett Counties - Property Tax - Credit for Construction of Housing Delegate Buckel 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 974
Ways and Means
2/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0777 (SB0625) Baltimore City - Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges - Tax Sales of Non-Owner-Occupied Residential Property Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Ways and Means
HB0991 /CH0531 (SB1074/CH0532) Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 531
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0992 /CH0562 (SB0835/CH0561) Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits Delegate Stein 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 562
Environment and Transportation
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1024 /CH0679 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - Connection Pipe Emergency Replacement Loan Program - Expansion PG/MC 101-24 Prince George's County Delegation and Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 679
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1161 (SB1051) Dorchester County - Sanitary Commission - Transfer of Powers to County Council Dorchester County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Energy, and the Environment
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1284 Wetlands and Waterways Program - Stream Restoration Projects Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1320 Bay Restoration Fund - Disbursement and Use of Fund Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1404 (SB1149) Environment – Storage of Dissolved Air Flotation By–Products – Local Authority Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1512 /CH0545 (SB1173) Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal Delegate Adams 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 545
Environment and Transportation
3/12/2024 - 3:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0096 (HB0024) Environment - Impact of Environmental Permits and State Agency Actions Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0625 (HB0777) Baltimore City – Unpaid Water and Sewer Charges – Tax Sales of Non–Owner–Occupied Residential Property Senator McCray 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing canceled
Budget and Taxation
SB0710 Water Utilities Shutoff Protections Senator Washington, M. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 /CH0561 (HB0992/CH0562) Environment - Delegated Authorities - Well and Septic Program Permits Senator Hester 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 561
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0993 Washington Suburban Sanitary Commission - System Development Charge - Review and Credit for Construction of Facility Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/08/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB1051 (HB1161) Dorchester County – Sanitary Commission – Transfer of Powers to County Council Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1074 /CH0532 (HB0991/CH0531) Agriculture - Food Processing Residuals Utilization Permit - Establishment Senator Ready 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 532
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1149 (HB1404) Environment - Storage of Dissolved Air Flotation By-Products - Local Authority Senator Mautz 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB1173 (HB1512/CH0545) Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal Senator Mautz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:49 PM
Click to return on the top page