Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Settlement Procedures

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0128 (SB0149)
Title
Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304
Title
State Procurement - Transparency and Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0798 (SB0589)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Interactive Dashboard
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1428 (SB0582)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Delegate Boafo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149 (HB0128)
Title
Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0510
Title
Excess Ownership of Single-Family Residences Excise Tax (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0582 (HB1428)
Title
Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025)
Sponsor
Senator Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0589 (HB0798)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Interactive Dashboard
Sponsor
Senator Augustine
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0128 (SB0149) Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Passed Enrolled
Economic Matters
1/23/2025 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Education, Energy, and the Environment
Finance
HB0304 State Procurement - Transparency and Procedures Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/04/2025 - 2:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0798 (SB0589) Opioid Restitution Fund - Interactive Dashboard Delegate Lehman 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Health and Government Operations
2/19/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1428 (SB0582) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Delegate Boafo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0149 (HB0128) Climate Change Adaptation and Mitigation - Total Assessed Cost of Greenhouse Gas Emissions - Study and Reports Senator Hester 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2025 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
SB0510 Excess Ownership of Single-Family Residences Excise Tax (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0582 (HB1428) Sale of Residential Property - Taxes and Offers to Purchase (End Hedge Fund Control of Maryland Homes Act of 2025) Senator Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/26 at 2:00 p.m. (Budget and Taxation) and Hearing canceled (Judicial Proceedings)
Budget and Taxation
2/26/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0589 (HB0798) Opioid Restitution Fund - Interactive Dashboard Senator Augustine 2 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Finance
2/18/2025 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/19/2025 - 2:15 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/7/2025 9:10 PM
Click to return on the top page