Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0935 (SB0784)
Title
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
Sponsor
Delegate Mireku-North
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1146
Title
Courts - Unenforceable Indemnity and Costs of Defense Agreements
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1427 (SB1005)
Title
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1482 /CH0857
Title
Uninsured Driving Penalties - Funding for the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund, Driver Education, and Transportation to Field Trips
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0107 (HB0514)
Title
Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots
Sponsor
Senator James
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684)
Title
Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond
Sponsor
Carroll County Senators
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB0935)
Title
Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1005 (HB1427)
Title
Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0749 /CH0608 (SB0400/CH0609) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 608
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0796 /CH0684 (SB0693) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 684
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0888 /CH0605 (SB0544/CH0604) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 605
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0935 (SB0784) Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act Delegate Mireku-North 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1146 Courts - Unenforceable Indemnity and Costs of Defense Agreements Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/06 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1427 (SB1005) Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Finance
Ways and Means
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1482 /CH0857 Uninsured Driving Penalties - Funding for the Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund, Driver Education, and Transportation to Field Trips Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 857
Economic Matters
3/11/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0107 (HB0514) Commercial Law - Statutory Liens - Motor Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots Senator James 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0400 /CH0609 (HB0749/CH0608) Corporations and Associations – Definitions, Emergencies, and Outstanding Stock – Revisions Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 609
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2024 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0544 /CH0604 (HB0888/CH0605) Corporations and Associations - Ratification of Defective Corporate Acts - Alterations Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 604
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0693 (HB0796/CH0684) Carroll County - Public Facilities Bond Carroll County Senators 4 2 In the Senate - Returned Passed
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/20/2024 - 2:00 PM
SB0784 (HB0935) Comprehensive Community Safety Funding Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/28 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB1005 (HB1427) Economic Development - West North Avenue Development Authority - Alterations Senator Hayes 2 2 In the House - Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Finance
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/28/2024 - 12:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:41 PM
Click to return on the top page