Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Securities

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0005 /CH0241 (SB0192/CH0242)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Krebs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0175
Title
Procurement - Performance and Payment Security - Requirements and Limitations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0192 /CH0242 (HB0005/CH0241)
Title
Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0327 /CH0311
Title
Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0005 /CH0241 (SB0192/CH0242) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Delegate Krebs 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Health and Government Operations
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0175 Procurement - Performance and Payment Security - Requirements and Limitations Senator Ellis 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0192 /CH0242 (HB0005/CH0241) Cemeteries - Perpetual Care - Distribution From Perpetual Care Trust Fund Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 242
Finance
1/21/2021 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0327 /CH0311 Civil Actions - Financial Exploitation of Susceptible Adults and Older Adults (Maryland SAFE Act) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 311
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page