Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Security Interests -see also- Liens

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 (SB0754)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0900
Title
Electricity - Data Centers - Rate Schedule and Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1035 (SB0937)
Title
Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act)
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171 /CH0111 (SB0992)
Title
Corporations and Associations – Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1405
Title
Commercial Law - Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots - Statutory Liens and Administrative Hearings
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0754 (HB0693)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1171/CH0111)
Title
Corporations and Associations - Revisions
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0693 (SB0754) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Special Order until 04/07 (Delegate Crosby) Adopted
Economic Matters
2/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0900 Electricity - Data Centers - Rate Schedule and Requirements Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB1035 (SB0937) Electricity and Gas - Emissions Reductions, Rate Regulation, Cost Recovery, Infrastructure, Planning, Renewable Energy Portfolio Standard, and Energy Assistance Programs (Next Generation Energy Act) Speaker 6 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Economic Matters
2/28/2025 - 1:30 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1171 /CH0111 (SB0992) Corporations and Associations – Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 111
Economic Matters
2/25/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1405 Commercial Law - Vehicles Towed or Removed From Parking Lots - Statutory Liens and Administrative Hearings Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
SB0754 (HB0693) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0992 (HB1171/CH0111) Corporations and Associations - Revisions Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/11/2025 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2025 2:22 PM
Click to return on the top page