Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Security Deposits

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0693 /CH0124 (SB0481)
Title
Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
Sponsor
Speaker
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1108 (SB1167)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1117 /CH0125 (SB0946)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0125 /CH0352 (HB0486/CH0351)
Title
Residential Property Sales - Contract Disclosures - Superfund Sites
Sponsor
Senator Lewis Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0481 (HB0693/CH0124)
Title
Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946 (HB1117/CH0125)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Kelly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1167 (HB1108)
Title
Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0693 /CH0124 (SB0481) Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024 Speaker 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 124
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB1108 (SB1167) Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1117 /CH0125 (SB0946) Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024) Delegate Stewart 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 125
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0125 /CH0352 (HB0486/CH0351) Residential Property Sales - Contract Disclosures - Superfund Sites Senator Lewis Young 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 352
Judicial Proceedings
1/30/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0481 (HB0693/CH0124) Renters' Rights and Stabilization Act of 2024 President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
SB0946 (HB1117/CH0125) Landlord and Tenant - Failure to Repair Serious and Dangerous Defects - Tenant Remedies (Tenant Safety Act of 2024) Senator Kelly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1167 (HB1108) Real Property - Residential Leases - Fee in Lieu of a Security Deposit Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
4/02/2024 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/2/2024 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page