Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Secretary of State

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0800 (SB0565)
Title
Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Queen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1368
Title
Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1413
Title
Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0534
Title
General Provisions - Full-Year Daylight Savings Time
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB0800)
Title
Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0898
Title
Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0800 (SB0565) Public Safety – Emergency Management – Price Gouging Consumer Protections Delegate Queen 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1368 Business Regulation - Social Media Websites - Censored Speech Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1413 Child Support Enforcement - License Applications - Taxpayer Identification Number Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0534 General Provisions - Full-Year Daylight Savings Time Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0565 (HB0800) Public Safety - Emergency Management - Price Gouging Consumer Protections Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance
Finance
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0898 Domestic Violence Survivor Resilience Loan Program and Guarantee Fund Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/17/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page