Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

School Testing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0702
Title
Higher Education - Standardized Tests - Prohibition of Use in Student Admissions
Sponsor
Delegate Ivey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1113
Title
Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Wivell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1157
Title
Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1159
Title
Higher Education – Community College Credits – General Education Courses
Sponsor
Delegate Thiam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1208
Title
Task Force to Study Academic Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education
Sponsor
Delegate Solomon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1357 (SB0945)
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsor
Delegate Clark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0668
Title
Good Job Opportunities for High School Graduates Act of 2021
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0879
Title
Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0945 (HB1357)
Title
Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055)
Title
Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions
Sponsor
President
6 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0702 Higher Education - Standardized Tests - Prohibition of Use in Student Admissions Delegate Ivey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1113 Primary and Secondary Education - Education Savings Account Program - Established Delegate Wivell 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1157 Education - Maryland High School Diploma - Civics Test Requirement Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/17 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1159 Higher Education – Community College Credits – General Education Courses Delegate Thiam 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1208 Task Force to Study Academic Credit for Prior Learning in Higher Education Delegate Solomon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Appropriations
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1357 (SB0945) Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment Delegate Clark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1372 /CH0055 (SB0965) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions Speaker 6 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 55
Appropriations
3/15/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Budget and Taxation
SB0668 Good Job Opportunities for High School Graduates Act of 2021 Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0879 Vehicle Laws – Driver’s Licenses – Driver Skills Examinations Senator Guzzone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0945 (HB1357) Calvert County Board of Education - Public Meetings - Public Comment Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/18/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0965 (HB1372/CH0055) Blueprint for Maryland's Future - Revisions President 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 3:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/15/2021 - 3:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/15/2021 2:19 PM
Click to return on the top page