Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

School Buses

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0054 (SB0129)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198)
Title
County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0087 (SB0253)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0226
Title
Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0284
Title
Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0373 /CH0192
Title
Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0753
Title
Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0832
Title
Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1275
Title
Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0129 (HB0054)
Title
Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors
Sponsor
Senator Gallion
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0253 (HB0087)
Title
Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197)
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0054 (SB0129) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Delegate Reilly 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0072 /CH0197 (SB0448/CH0198) County Boards of Education – Student Transportation – Vehicles and Report Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 197
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0087 (SB0253) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Environment and Transportation
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0226 Baltimore City – Complete Streets Program Funding – Traffic and Vehicle Monitoring Systems Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0284 Vehicle Laws – Dedicated Bus Lanes – Enforcement Delegate Lewis, R. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0373 /CH0192 Education - Child Abuse and Sexual Misconduct Prevention - Hiring Emergent Employees Delegate Wilson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 192
Ways and Means
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0753 Education - Student-Organized Peaceful Demonstrations - Student Discipline and Policy Delegate Ebersole 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0832 Public Utilities – Electric School Bus Pilot Program Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1275 Maryland Automobile Insurance Fund – Liability Insurance – School Bus Contractors Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0129 (HB0054) Education – Harford County – Liability of School Bus Contractors Senator Gallion 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/20 at 3:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
1/20/2021 - 3:00 PM
SB0253 (HB0087) Vehicle Laws - School Bus Safety - Occupant Capacity Senator Elfreth 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
1/27/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0448 /CH0198 (HB0072/CH0197) County Boards of Education - Student Transportation - Vehicles and Report Senator Edwards 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 198
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/20/2021 5:40 PM
Click to return on the top page