Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Savings and Loan Associations

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0322
Title
Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0599
Title
Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0543 /CH0600
Title
Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance
Sponsor
Delegate McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1437 (SB0699)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0699 (HB1437)
Title
Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0322 Courts - Judgments - Exemptions From Execution Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0528 /CH0599 Town of Williamsport (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 599
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0543 /CH0600 Town of Hancock (Washington County) - Urban Renewal Authority for Blight Clearance Delegate McKay 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 600
Environment and Transportation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1437 (SB0699) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0699 (HB1437) Public High Schools - Financial Literacy - Curriculum, Graduation Requirement, and Professional Development Senator Klausmeier 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:15 PM
Click to return on the top page