Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Information Technology - Generally (S1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0346
Title
Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0348
Title
General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data
Sponsor
Delegate Novotny
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811)
Title
State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243)
Title
State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Hester
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169)
Title
Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0346 Department of Information Technology - Oversight of Legislative Branch Information Technology Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0348 General Assembly and Legislative Branch of State Government - Security Training - Protecting Security-Sensitive Data Delegate Novotny 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1205 /CH0243 (SB0811) State Government – Information Technology and Cybersecurity–Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 243
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1276 /CH0169 (SB0870/CH0170) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Delegate Attar 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 169
Ways and Means
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0811 (HB1205/CH0243) State Government - Information Technology and Cybersecurity-Related Infrastructure (Modernize Maryland Act of 2022) Senator Hester 2 2 In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (115-15)
Budget and Taxation
3/01/2022 - 2:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
Appropriations
SB0870 /CH0170 (HB1276/CH0169) Baltimore City Youth Data Hub - Establishment Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 170
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/19/2022 11:33 AM
Click to return on the top page