Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rural Areas

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0222 /CH0565 (SB0416)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0376
Title
Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037)
Title
Maryland Corps Program - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0339
Title
State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management
Sponsor
Delegate Gilchrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0993 /CH0466 (SB0919)
Title
Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1029 (SB0937)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0845)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1240 (SB0986)
Title
Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Delegate Jacobs
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443)
Title
Maryland Corps Program – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0416 (HB0222/CH0565)
Title
Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0845 (HB1095)
Title
Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0919 (HB0993/CH0466)
Title
Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0937 (HB1029)
Title
Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment
Sponsor
Senator Eckardt
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0986 (HB1240)
Title
Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0222 /CH0565 (SB0416) Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Delegate Parrott 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 565
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0376 Outdoor Preschool License Pilot Program - Establishment Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0443 (SB0228/CH0037) Maryland Corps Program - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0727 (SB0541/CH0039) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB0884 /CH0339 State Conservation Land - Old-Growth Forests - Management Delegate Gilchrist 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 339
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0993 /CH0466 (SB0919) Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 466
Ways and Means
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1029 (SB0937) Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0845) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1240 (SB0986) Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding Delegate Jacobs 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0228 /CH0037 (HB0443) Maryland Corps Program – Revisions Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 37
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0416 (HB0222/CH0565) Vehicle Laws - Driving in Right-Hand Lanes - Interstate Highways in Rural Areas Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0845 (HB1095) Economic Development - Maryland Technology Development Corporation - Rural Business Innovation Initiative Fund Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0919 (HB0993/CH0466) Child Care Capital Support Revolving Loan Fund - Established Senator King 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0937 (HB1029) Maryland Higher Education Commission – Access to Mental Health Advisory Committee – Establishment Senator Eckardt 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0986 (HB1240) Education - Low-Density Calculation - Mandated Funding Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page