Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Rivers, Streams, and Lakes

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0149
Title
Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice
Sponsor
Delegate Bagnall
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0711 (SB0466/CH0471)
Title
Potomac River Compact – Clarification of the Effectiveness of Amendments
Sponsor
Joint Committee on Federal Relations
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0716 /CH0615 (SB0367)
Title
Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0921 (SB0366)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Saab
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1070
Title
Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1075 (SB0674)
Title
Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Funding and Sunset – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1218
Title
Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138)
Title
Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237)
Title
Conservation Finance Act
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0366 (HB0921)
Title
Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Simonaire
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0367 (HB0716/CH0615)
Title
Patuxent River Commission - Membership
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0466 /CH0471 (HB0711)
Title
Potomac River Compact - Clarification of the Effectiveness of Amendments
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727)
Title
Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act)
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0674 (HB1075)
Title
Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Funding and Sunset - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0149 Wetlands and Waterways – Riparian Rights – Voluntary Registry and Notice Delegate Bagnall 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0275 /CH0138 (SB0273/CH0139) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 138
Health and Government Operations
2/09/2022 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0653 /CH0237 (SB0348/CH0238) Conservation Finance Act Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 237
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0711 (SB0466/CH0471) Potomac River Compact – Clarification of the Effectiveness of Amendments Joint Committee on Federal Relations 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Rules
HB0716 /CH0615 (SB0367) Patuxent River Commission - Membership Delegate Lehman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 615
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0921 (SB0366) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Delegate Saab 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1070 Solid Waste Disposal and Diversion and On–Farm Composting and Compost Use Delegate Boyce 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1075 (SB0674) Natural Resources – State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund – Funding and Sunset – Alterations Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m. (Environment and Transportation)
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
HB1218 Anne Arundel County - Natural Resources - Fishing With a Haul Seine Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
SB0273 /CH0139 (HB0275/CH0138) Environment – PFAS Chemicals – Prohibitions and Requirements (George “Walter” Taylor Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 139
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0348 /CH0238 (HB0653/CH0237) Conservation Finance Act Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 238
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
SB0366 (HB0921) Chesapeake and Atlantic Coastal Bays 2010 Trust Fund - Use of Funds (Chesapeake Bay Lockbox Protection Act of 2022) Senator Simonaire 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0367 (HB0716/CH0615) Patuxent River Commission - Membership Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0466 /CH0471 (HB0711) Potomac River Compact - Clarification of the Effectiveness of Amendments Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 471
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0541 /CH0039 (HB0727) Natural Resources - Maryland Park Service and State Parks - Alterations (Great Maryland Outdoors Act) Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Environment and Transportation
Appropriations
SB0674 (HB1075) Natural Resources - State Lakes Protection and Restoration Fund - Funding and Sunset - Alterations Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/23/2022 2:16 PM
Click to return on the top page