Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Ridesharing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0796
Title
For-Hire Driving Services - Return of Property Left in Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1055
Title
Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1229 (SB0835)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsor
Delegate Carey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0210 /CH0118
Title
Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration
Sponsor
Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0552 (HB0695)
Title
Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0835 (HB1229)
Title
Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0796 For-Hire Driving Services - Return of Property Left in Vehicles Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1055 Baltimore City - Maryland Transit Administration - Transit Services for Public School Students and Youth Workers Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - House Requests Senate Recede
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Budget and Taxation
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1229 (SB0835) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver Delegate Carey 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
SB0210 /CH0118 Tax Credits - Employer-Provided Commuter Benefits - Expansion and Administration Chair, Budget and Taxation Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 118
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0552 (HB0695) Environment - Climate Crisis Plan - Requirement (Better Together to Save Our Weather Act of 2022) Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0835 (HB1229) Motor Vehicle Insurance - Comprehensive Coverage and Collision Damage Waiver Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/22/2022 2:00 PM
Click to return on the top page