Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Ridesharing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0242)
Title
Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0558 /CH0269 (SB0429/CH0270)
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Davis, D.E.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0869 (SB0688)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1304 (SB0705)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0242 (HB0116)
Title
Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 /CH0270 (HB0558/CH0269)
Title
For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kelley
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0688 (HB0869)
Title
Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0705 (HB1304)
Title
State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 (SB0242) Transportation – I–270 Commuter Bus Route Study Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0558 /CH0269 (SB0429/CH0270) For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements Delegate Davis, D.E. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 269
Economic Matters
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0869 (SB0688) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing and Short-Term Vehicle Rentals - Alterations and Distribution Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1209 Sales and Use Tax - Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Ways and Means
3/04/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1304 (SB0705) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/25 at 1:30 p.m. (Economic Matters)
Economic Matters
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0242 (HB0116) Transportation - I-270 Commuter Bus Route Study Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
SB0429 /CH0270 (HB0558/CH0269) For-Hire Driving and Vehicles - Requirements Senator Kelley 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 270
Finance
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0688 (HB0869) Sales and Use and Vehicle Excise Taxes – Peer–to–Peer Car Sharing and Short–Term Vehicle Rentals – Alterations and Distribution Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0705 (HB1304) State Airports - Commercial Activity - Rental Vehicles and Peer-to-Peer Car Sharing Senator Beidle 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters and Environment and Transportation
Finance
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/1/2021 4:01 PM
Click to return on the top page