Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Review Boards

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0230
Title
Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Proctor
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0525
Title
St. Mary’s County – Law Enforcement Hearing Board – Civilian Members
Sponsor
Delegate Morgan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0670 /CH0059
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0687 (SB0381)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Uniform Disciplinary Procedures
Sponsor
Delegate McComas
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1316 (SB0752/CH0366)
Title
Baltimore City – Police Officers – Promotional Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0260
Title
Public Safety - Police Officers' Performance Review Board
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0381 (HB0687)
Title
Law Enforcement Officers’ Bill of Rights – Uniform Disciplinary Procedures
Sponsor
Senator Cassilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0752 /CH0366 (HB1316)
Title
Baltimore City - Police Officers - Promotional Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0230 Inmates - Life Imprisonment - Parole Reform Delegate Proctor 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0525 St. Mary’s County – Law Enforcement Hearing Board – Civilian Members Delegate Morgan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0670 /CH0059 Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Police Discipline and Law Enforcement Programs and Procedures Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override - Chapter 59
Judiciary
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0687 (SB0381) Law Enforcement Officers' Bill of Rights - Uniform Disciplinary Procedures Delegate McComas 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/12 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/12/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1316 (SB0752/CH0366) Baltimore City – Police Officers – Promotional Appointments Delegate Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0260 Public Safety - Police Officers' Performance Review Board Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/21 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/21/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0381 (HB0687) Law Enforcement Officers’ Bill of Rights – Uniform Disciplinary Procedures Senator Cassilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/28 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0752 /CH0366 (HB1316) Baltimore City - Police Officers - Promotional Appointments Senator Hayes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 366
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Judiciary
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 10:24 AM
Click to return on the top page