Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Restrooms

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0205 /CH0705 (SB0427/CH0706)
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Reznik
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0321 /CH0223 (SB0061/CH0224)
Title
Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Ebersole
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0401 /CH0345 (SB0438/CH0346)
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0715 (SB0665)
Title
Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Guyton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0061 /CH0224 (HB0321/CH0223)
Title
Public Buildings – Changing Facilities – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0418
Title
Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Pinsky
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0427 /CH0706 (HB0205/CH0705)
Title
Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0438 /CH0346 (HB0401/CH0345)
Title
Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0579
Title
Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0665 (HB0715)
Title
Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0069 Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0205 /CH0705 (SB0427/CH0706) Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement Delegate Reznik 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 705
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0321 /CH0223 (SB0061/CH0224) Public Buildings - Changing Facilities - Requirements Delegate Ebersole 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 223
Health and Government Operations
1/14/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0401 /CH0345 (SB0438/CH0346) Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Delegate Guyton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 345
Ways and Means
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0715 (SB0665) Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices Delegate Guyton 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0061 /CH0224 (HB0321/CH0223) Public Buildings – Changing Facilities – Requirements Senator Lam 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 224
Judicial Proceedings
1/28/2021 - 11:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
SB0418 Maryland Energy Administration – Energy and Water Efficiency Standards – Alterations Senator Pinsky 2 2 In the House - Hearing 4/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0427 /CH0706 (HB0205/CH0705) Public Schools - Provision of Menstrual Hygiene Products - Requirement Senator Elfreth 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 706
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0438 /CH0346 (HB0401/CH0345) Public Schools - Pregnant and Parenting Students - Policies and Reports Senator Washington 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 346
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
Ways and Means
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0579 Health Care Facilities – Restrooms – Requirements Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0665 (HB0715) Public Schools - Self-Contained Special Education Classrooms - Use of Video Recording Devices Senator Peters 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:21 AM
Click to return on the top page