Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0073 (SB0454)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Completion of Sentence
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0209 /CH0945 (SB0623/CH0946)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0359
Title
Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings
Sponsor
Delegate Long, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0574 (SB0509)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0658 (SB0602)
Title
Criminal Procedure – Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0980 /CH0852 (SB0751/CH0851)
Title
Public Health - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114 (SB0992)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent, Breach of Lease, and Tenant Holding Over
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1182
Title
Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Enforcement Remedies
Sponsor
Chair, Economic Matters Committee
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0314
Title
Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act)
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0509 (HB0574)
Title
Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0602 (HB0658)
Title
Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0623 /CH0946 (HB0209/CH0945)
Title
Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0751 /CH0851 (HB0980/CH0852)
Title
Public Health – Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund – Revisions
Sponsor
Senator Klausmeier
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0992 (HB1114)
Title
Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent, Breach of Lease, and Tenant Holding Over
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1099 /CH0764
Title
Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings
Sponsor
Senator Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0073 (SB0454) Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Completion of Sentence Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0209 /CH0945 (SB0623/CH0946) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Delegate Amprey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 945
Judiciary
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0359 Petition for Guardianship of the Property of Alleged Disabled Person - Stay of Civil Actions and Proceedings Delegate Long, J. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/07/2024 - 2:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0574 (SB0509) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0658 (SB0602) Criminal Procedure – Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024) Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/05/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB0980 /CH0852 (SB0751/CH0851) Public Health - Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund - Revisions Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 852
Health and Government Operations
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1114 (SB0992) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent, Breach of Lease, and Tenant Holding Over Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1182 Commercial Law - Maryland Antitrust Act - Enforcement Remedies Chair, Economic Matters Committee 6 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/26/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0314 Juvenile Law - Willful Misconduct of a Minor - Civil Liability of a Parent, Legal Guardian, or Custodian (Parental Accountability Act) Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0509 (HB0574) Commercial Financing - Small Business Truth in Lending Act Senator Kramer 2 2 In the House - First Reading Economic Matters
Finance
2/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0602 (HB0658) Criminal Procedure - Automated Expungement, Waiting Periods, and Adverse Actions (Clean Slate Act of 2024) Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0623 /CH0946 (HB0209/CH0945) Prison Education Delivery Reform Commission Senator Carter 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 946
Finance
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0751 /CH0851 (HB0980/CH0852) Public Health – Opioid Restitution Advisory Council and Fund – Revisions Senator Klausmeier 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 851
Finance
3/01/2024 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/27/2024 - 1:30 PM
SB0992 (HB1114) Real Property - Landlord and Tenant - Procedures for Failure to Pay Rent, Breach of Lease, and Tenant Holding Over Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1099 /CH0764 Emergency Services - Automated External Defibrillator and Naloxone Co-Location Initiative - Requirements for Public Buildings Senator Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 764
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
Health and Government Operations
4/02/2024 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:46 PM
Click to return on the top page