Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Restitution

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0111 (SB0732)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0824 /CH0685 (SB0629)
Title
Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Data - Collection and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 /CH0084 (SB0419/CH0085)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1087
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - State-Subdivision Agreement and Grant Program
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1354
Title
Crimes – Public Monuments – Destruction of Property
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0356
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0419 /CH0085 (HB1086/CH0084)
Title
Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0580
Title
Sewer Systems and Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Pollution - Shellfish Harvester Restitution
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0629 (HB0824/CH0685)
Title
Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0732 (HB0111)
Title
Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents
Sponsor
Senator Watson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0111 (SB0732) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Appropriations
1/18/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB0824 /CH0685 (SB0629) Landlord and Tenant - Eviction Data - Collection and Distribution Delegate Williams 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Judiciary
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB1086 /CH0084 (SB0419/CH0085) Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 84
Appropriations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB1087 Opioid Restitution Fund - State-Subdivision Agreement and Grant Program Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
HB1354 Crimes – Public Monuments – Destruction of Property Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0356 Criminal Procedure - Expungement - Entitlement Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0419 /CH0085 (HB1086/CH0084) Opioid Restitution Fund - Appropriation of Settlement Funds and Grant Program Senator Feldman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 85
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/22/2022 - 1:40 PM
SB0580 Sewer Systems and Wastewater Treatment Plants - Water Pollution - Shellfish Harvester Restitution Senator Bailey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0629 (HB0824/CH0685) Landlord and Tenant – Eviction Data – Collection and Distribution Senator Edwards 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0732 (HB0111) Action to Collect a Private Education Loan - Required Documents Senator Watson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:24 PM
Click to return on the top page