Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Restaurants

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0069
Title
Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0264 /CH0439 (SB0483/CH0440)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Delegate Charkoudian
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0572 /CH0555 (SB0426/CH0556)
Title
Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0883 /CH0545 (SB0677/CH0546)
Title
Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License
Sponsor
Allegany County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0979 (SB0739/CH0666)
Title
Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21
Sponsor
Prince George's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0995
Title
Sales and Use Tax – Restaurant Utilities – Exemption
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1152 /CH0661
Title
Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1241 (SB0791)
Title
Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Frederick County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1318
Title
Maryland Business Tax Relief Act
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140)
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0483 /CH0440 (HB0264/CH0439)
Title
Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals
Sponsor
Senator Hettleman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612)
Title
Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0739 /CH0666 (HB0979)
Title
Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – BLX License
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0791 (HB1241)
Title
Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0012 /CH0140 (SB0205/CH0141) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Delegate Watson, C. 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 140
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0069 Environment - Single-Use Plastics - Restrictions Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
HB0264 /CH0439 (SB0483/CH0440) Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Delegate Charkoudian 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 439
Environment and Transportation
1/27/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0572 /CH0555 (SB0426/CH0556) Baltimore City - 46th District - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 555
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0883 /CH0545 (SB0677/CH0546) Allegany County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B-D Beer, Wine, and Liquor License Allegany County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 545
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0979 (SB0739/CH0666) Prince George's County - Alcoholic Beverages - BLX License PG 318-21 Prince George's County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0995 Sales and Use Tax – Restaurant Utilities – Exemption Delegate Qi 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/18 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1152 /CH0661 Howard County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Beer, Wine, and Liquor License - Off-Premises Consumption Ho. Co. 04-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 661
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1241 (SB0791) Frederick County - Alcoholic Beverages - Class B Licenses - Off-Premises Consumption Frederick County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Economic Matters
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1318 Maryland Business Tax Relief Act Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0205 /CH0141 (HB0012/CH0140) Alcoholic Beverages - Sale or Delivery for Off-Premises Consumption Senator Hettleman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 141
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0483 /CH0440 (HB0264/CH0439) Solid Waste Management - Organics Recycling and Waste Diversion - Food Residuals Senator Hettleman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 440
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0496 /CH0039 (HB0612) Recovery for the Economy, Livelihoods, Industries, Entrepreneurs, and Families (RELIEF) Act President 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 39
Budget and Taxation
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0739 /CH0666 (HB0979) Prince George’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – BLX License Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 666
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0791 (HB1241) Frederick County – Alcoholic Beverages – Class B Licenses – Off–Premises Consumption Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/05 at 2:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/05/2021 - 2:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page