Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Reproductive Matters -see also- Abortion; Birth Control

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0050
Title
Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0142
Title
Health Insurance - Coverage of In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0669 /CH0682 (SB0503)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Doula Services – Coverage
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1171
Title
Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, A.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1335 (SB0843)
Title
Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1360
Title
Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs
Sponsor
Delegate Cox
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0503 (HB0669/CH0682)
Title
Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0504
Title
Equal Protection of Unborn Human Beings Act of 2022
Sponsor
Senator Salling
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0843 (HB1335)
Title
Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent
Sponsor
Senator Sydnor
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0050 Public Health – Abortion, Artificial Insemination, and Sterilization – Requirement Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0142 Health Insurance - Coverage of In Vitro Fertilization - Revisions Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/27 at 4:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
1/27/2022 - 4:00 PM
HB0669 /CH0682 (SB0503) Maryland Medical Assistance Program – Doula Services – Coverage Delegate Wilkins 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 682
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
Finance
HB0765 (SB0166/CH0726) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Program Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/16/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB1171 Declaration of Rights - Right to Reproductive Liberty Delegate Jones, A. 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1335 (SB0843) Perinatal Care - Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening - Consent Delegate Williams 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1360 Public Health - Abortion-Inducing Drugs Delegate Cox 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/11/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0166 /CH0726 (HB0765) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 726
Finance
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Health and Government Operations
3/30/2022 - 1:30 PM
SB0503 (HB0669/CH0682) Maryland Medical Assistance Program - Doula Services - Coverage Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0504 Equal Protection of Unborn Human Beings Act of 2022 Senator Salling 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
SB0843 (HB1335) Perinatal Care – Drug and Alcohol Testing and Screening – Consent Senator Sydnor 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page