Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Repeat Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Delegate Lehman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0110 (SB0429)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0127
Title
Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0207
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0304
Title
Criminal Law - Failure to Obey a Reasonable and Lawful Order
Sponsor
Delegate Ruth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0423 (SB0396)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0817 /CH0168
Title
Criminal Law – Violation of a Protective Order – Merger Prohibition and Separate Sentence Authorization
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0837 /CH0026
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Delegate Clippinger
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1021 /CH0055
Title
Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements
Sponsor
Speaker
6 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1054 (SB0784)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1065
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1078 /CH0511 (SB0788/CH0512)
Title
Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol
Sponsor
Delegate Pena-Melnyk
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1132
Title
Gun Theft Felony Act of 2022
Sponsor
Delegate Beitzel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181)
Title
Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0396 (HB0423)
Title
Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0429 (HB0110)
Title
Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0533
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0691 /CH0041
Title
Juvenile Justice Reform
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0784 (HB1054)
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Senator Carter
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0833
Title
Cannabis Reform
Sponsor
Senator Feldman
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0016 /CH0181 (SB0044/CH0182) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Delegate Lehman 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 181
Environment and Transportation
1/13/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0110 (SB0429) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Delegate Shetty 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
1/27/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0127 Maryland Longitudinal Data System Center – Division of Correction – Data Requirement Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/25 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
1/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
HB0207 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime Involving a Handgun Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB0304 Criminal Law - Failure to Obey a Reasonable and Lawful Order Delegate Ruth 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0423 (SB0396) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0817 /CH0168 Criminal Law – Violation of a Protective Order – Merger Prohibition and Separate Sentence Authorization Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 168
Judiciary
2/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0837 /CH0026 Cannabis Reform Delegate Clippinger 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 26
Judiciary
2/14/2022 - 10:00 AM
Finance
3/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1021 /CH0055 Public Safety – Licensed Firearms Dealers – Security Requirements Speaker 6 2 Gubernatorial Veto Override (Legislative date: 4/8/2022) - Chapter 55
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1054 (SB0784) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1065 Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release - Crime of Violence Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1078 /CH0511 (SB0788/CH0512) Cannabis - Regulation - Delta-8- and Delta-10-Tetrahydrocannabinol Delegate Pena-Melnyk 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 511
Health and Government Operations
3/09/2022 - 3:00 PM
Judiciary
Finance
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1132 Gun Theft Felony Act of 2022 Delegate Beitzel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0044 /CH0182 (HB0016/CH0181) Crimes - Unattended Dogs - Extreme Weather Conditions and Heat Senator West 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 182
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0396 (HB0423) Crimes - Firearms - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2022) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0429 (HB0110) Criminal Law - Stalking - Penalties Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0533 Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0691 /CH0041 Juvenile Justice Reform Senator Carter 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(b) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 41
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0784 (HB1054) Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Senator Carter 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0833 Cannabis Reform Senator Feldman 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Finance
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:13 PM
Click to return on the top page