Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Repeat Offenders

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0068 (SB0115)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, T.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity
Sponsor
Delegate Moon
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0638 (SB0624)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Delegate Lopez
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Prior Convictions - Conviction for the Drunk or Drugged Operation of a Vessel
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1028 (SB0875)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Delegate Crutchfield
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1114
Title
Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Yard Waste – Disposal on Highways
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0114 /CH0620
Title
Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0115 (HB0068)
Title
Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0560
Title
Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0624 (HB0638)
Title
Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms
Sponsor
Senator Lee
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0842
Title
Workgroup to Study the Assessment, Treatment, and Available Resources for Female Youth in Contact With the Justice System
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0852
Title
Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Senator Hough
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0875 (HB1028)
Title
Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0068 (SB0115) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program Delegate Branch, T. 2 2 In the House - Hearing canceled
Judiciary
HB0488 Criminal Law - Use or Possession of a Controlled Dangerous Substance - De Minimis Quantity Delegate Moon 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0638 (SB0624) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Delegate Lopez 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/01 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0675 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Prior Convictions - Conviction for the Drunk or Drugged Operation of a Vessel Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1028 (SB0875) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Delegate Crutchfield 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
HB1114 Illegal Dumping and Litter Control Law – Yard Waste – Disposal on Highways Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1164 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0114 /CH0620 Criminal Procedure - Expungement of Conviction and Subsequent Offender Penalties - Driving While Privilege Is Canceled, Suspended, Refused, or Revoked Senator McCray 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 620
Judicial Proceedings
1/19/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
4/01/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0115 (HB0068) Baltimore City and Prince George's County - Diversionary and Reentry Program Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 12:30 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/04/2021 - 12:30 PM
SB0560 Criminal Law - Theft of a Handgun Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0624 (HB0638) Public Safety - Untraceable and Undetectable Firearms Senator Lee 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0842 Workgroup to Study the Assessment, Treatment, and Available Resources for Female Youth in Contact With the Justice System Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 12:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2021 - 12:00 PM
SB0852 Crimes - Penalties and Procedures (Violent Firearms Offender Act of 2021) Senator Hough 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
3/03/2021 - 12:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0875 (HB1028) Juvenile Law - Dispositions - Placement Guidance Senator Jackson 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:15 PM
Click to return on the top page