Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0187 /CH0716
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0362
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0488
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0518 (SB0232/CH0427)
Title
Registers of Wills - Maximum Salary - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Williams
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0232 /CH0427 (HB0518)
Title
Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase
Sponsor
Senator Jackson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0187 /CH0716 Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees Delegate Terrasa 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 716
Judiciary
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0362 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 13-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0488 Local Public Campaign Financing – Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0518 (SB0232/CH0427) Registers of Wills - Maximum Salary - Increase Delegate Williams 2 2 In the Senate - Second Reading Passed
Judiciary
3/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0232 /CH0427 (HB0518) Registers of Wills – Maximum Salary – Increase Senator Jackson 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 427
Judicial Proceedings
2/02/2022 - 2:00 PM
Judiciary
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:27 PM
Click to return on the top page