Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Registers of Wills

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0433
Title
Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0681 /CH0525
Title
Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0766
Title
Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees
Sponsor
Delegate Terrasa
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0767
Title
Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1066
Title
Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices
Sponsor
Delegate Feldmark
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1250
Title
Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland
Sponsor
Delegate Malone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513)
Title
Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0433 Montgomery County – Public Campaign Financing – Expansion MC 14–21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0681 /CH0525 Task Force to Study the Maryland Orphans' Courts Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 525
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB0766 Estates and Trusts – Administration of Estates – Fees Delegate Terrasa 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/22 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0767 Montgomery County - Voting Methods MC 22-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1066 Local Public Campaign Financing - Expansion to Additional Offices Delegate Feldmark 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1250 Task Force to Study the Laws of Intestacy in Maryland Delegate Malone 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/31 at 1:45 p.m.
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/31/2021 - 1:45 PM
HB1266 /CH0513 (SB0700) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 513
Judiciary
2/22/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0700 (HB1266/CH0513) Estates and Trusts - Wills - Custodianship Senator West 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 12:19 PM
Click to return on the top page