Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Referendum

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0032
Title
Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021)
Sponsor
Delegate Lewis, J.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0035
Title
Judges – Selection and Retention
Sponsor
Delegate Cardin
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0082 (SB0151)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, W.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0447
Title
Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming
Sponsor
Delegate Watson, R.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0899 (SB0670/CH0598)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0902 (SB0669/CH0809)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1027 (SB0786/CH0133)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Delegate Wells
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1158
Title
Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum
Sponsor
Delegate Fisher, M.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1226
Title
Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request
Sponsor
Delegate Lisanti
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1237 (SB0908)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Delegate Korman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0151 (HB0082)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights
Sponsor
Senator Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0295
Title
Circuit Court Judges - Election
Sponsor
Senator Kramer
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083)
Title
Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming
Sponsor
Senator Peters
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0669 /CH0809 (HB0902)
Title
Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0670 /CH0598 (HB0899)
Title
Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0786 /CH0133 (HB1027)
Title
Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0908 (HB1237)
Title
Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel
Sponsor
Senator Benson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0032 Cannabis - Legalization and Regulation (Inclusion, Restoration, and Rehabilitation Act of 2021) Delegate Lewis, J. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/16 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Health and Government Operations
HB0035 Judges – Selection and Retention Delegate Cardin 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0082 (SB0151) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Delegate Fisher, W. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0447 Judges - Selection, Election, Tenure, and Continuance in Office Delegate Dumais 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
HB0885 /CH0083 (SB0666/CH0082) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals – Renaming Delegate Watson, R. 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 83
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0899 (SB0670/CH0598) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0902 (SB0669/CH0809) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Delegate Bartlett 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Rules
HB1027 (SB0786/CH0133) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City Delegate Wells 4 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Judiciary
Judicial Proceedings
HB1158 Calvert County - Training on The 1776 Report - Referendum Delegate Fisher, M. 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1226 Municipal Incorporation - County Commissioners or County Council - Required Approval of Referendum Request Delegate Lisanti 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/02 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1237 (SB0908) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Delegate Korman 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Appropriations
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0151 (HB0082) Constitutional Amendment - Environmental Rights Senator Patterson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB0295 Circuit Court Judges - Election Senator Kramer 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
1/26/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0666 /CH0082 (HB0885/CH0083) Courts of Appeals and Special Appeals - Renaming Senator Peters 2 2 Approved by the Governor, assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 82
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0669 /CH0809 (HB0902) Constitutional Amendment - Civil Jury Trials Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Assigned a chapter number, enactment subject to constitutional referendum - Chapter 809
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0670 /CH0598 (HB0899) Courts - Civil Jury Trials - Amount in Controversy Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 598
Judicial Proceedings
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
3/31/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0786 /CH0133 (HB1027) Maryland Police Accountability Act of 2021 - Baltimore City - Control of the Police Department of Baltimore City Senator McCray 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 133
Judicial Proceedings
2/11/2021 - 11:00 AM
Judiciary
SB0908 (HB1237) Budget Bill – Appropriations Statement – Memorandum of Understanding for State Personnel Senator Benson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page