Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Recordation

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0933 (SB0566)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1069 /CH0622
Title
Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program
Sponsor
Delegate Stewart
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0781)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0566 (HB0933)
Title
Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1095)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0933 (SB0566) Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund Delegate Bartlett 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
HB1069 /CH0622 Water Supply - Private Well Safety Program Delegate Stewart 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 622
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1095 (SB0781) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0566 (HB0933) Anne Arundel County – Transfer Tax – Housing Trust Special Revenue Fund Senator Elfreth 4 2 In the House - First Reading Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0781 (HB1095) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:17 PM
Click to return on the top page