Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Reapportionment and Redistricting

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0827 (SB0619)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0965
Title
Congressional Districts - Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Patterson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1142 /CH0187
Title
Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1190 /CH0396
Title
Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1343 /CH0685
Title
Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements
Sponsor
Delegate Kipke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0619 (HB0827)
Title
No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404)
Title
Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0827 (SB0619) No Representation Without Population Act – Repeal Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB0965 Congressional Districts - Standards Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/15 at 9:30 a.m.
Rules and Executive Nominations
3/15/2021 - 9:30 AM
HB1060 /CH0404 (SB0749/CH0405) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Delegate Patterson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 404
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1142 /CH0187 Howard County – School Redistricting – Public Testimony Ho. Co. 07-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 187
Ways and Means
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1190 /CH0396 Howard County – Board of Education – Redetermination of Geographic Attendance Area Ho. Co. 05-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 396
Ways and Means
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1343 /CH0685 Anne Arundel County – Party Central Committees – Republican Requirements Delegate Kipke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 685
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0619 (HB0827) No Representation Without Population Act - Repeal Senator Edwards 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/18/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0749 /CH0405 (HB1060/CH0404) Charles County - Board of Education - Membership Alterations Senator Ellis 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 405
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:18 AM
Click to return on the top page