Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Real Estate -see also- Agents and Brokers

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0019 /CH0590
Title
Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money
Sponsor
Delegate Holmes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0239 (SB0073)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0541 /CH0593
Title
Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0560
Title
Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status
Sponsor
Delegate Fennell
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Delegate Dumais
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0952
Title
Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations
Sponsor
Delegate Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0972
Title
Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Branch, C.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1095 (SB0781)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0073 (HB0239)
Title
State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779)
Title
Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0781 (HB1095)
Title
Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification
Sponsor
Senator Hayes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0896
Title
Workgroup on the COVID-19 Crisis Economic Recovery
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0019 /CH0590 Residential Real Estate Transactions – Escrow Agents and Trust Money Delegate Holmes 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 590
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/17/2021 - 12:30 PM
HB0239 (SB0073) State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Delegate Rogers 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
1/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0541 /CH0593 Montgomery County – Residential Property Sales – School District Information MC 01-21 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/23/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0560 Human Relations - Discrimination in Housing - Reentry-Into-Society Status Delegate Fennell 2 2 In the House - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0781 /CH0779 (SB0263/CH0780) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts – Miscellaneous Delegate Dumais 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 779
Economic Matters
2/17/2021 - 1:30 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0952 Real Property – Sale of Apartment Facilities – Rights of Qualified Organizations Delegate Washington 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/19/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0972 Real Estate - Workgroup to Study Real Estate Trust Money Distribution Delegate Branch, C. 2 2 In the Senate - Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
3/02/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB1095 (SB0781) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0073 (HB0239) State Real Estate Commission - Property Managers - Registration Senator Young 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0263 /CH0780 (HB0781/CH0779) Corporations and Real Estate Investment Trusts - Miscellaneous Senator West 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 780
Judicial Proceedings
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0781 (HB1095) Real Property – Residential Contract of Sale – Buyer Identification Senator Hayes 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Judicial Proceedings
3/02/2021 - 1:00 PM
SB0896 Workgroup on the COVID-19 Crisis Economic Recovery Senator Rosapepe 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m. (Finance)
Finance
3/10/2021 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:52 AM
Click to return on the top page