Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Railroads

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0104
Title
Healthy Working Families Act - Railroad Employees - Unpaid Leave
Sponsor
Delegate Harrison
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738)
Title
Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0379 /CH0597 (SB0547/CH0596)
Title
Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0538 /CH0122 (SB0484)
Title
Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116)
Title
State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Shetty
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0836 (SB0681)
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Workgroup (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Edelson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1001
Title
Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1126 (SB0785)
Title
Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1446 (SB1060)
Title
Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Delegate Stein
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0131
Title
Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Categorization and Equitable Distribution of Projects
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0287 /CH0738 (HB0172/CH0737)
Title
Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0484 (HB0538/CH0122)
Title
Land Use - Affordable Housing - Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024)
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0547 /CH0596 (HB0379/CH0597)
Title
Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0681 (HB0836)
Title
Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Lam
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0785 (HB1126)
Title
Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0966 /CH0722
Title
Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1060 (HB1446)
Title
Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024)
Sponsor
Senator Ellis
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB1070
Title
Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place
Sponsor
Senator McKay
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0104 Healthy Working Families Act - Railroad Employees - Unpaid Leave Delegate Harrison 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB0172 /CH0737 (SB0287/CH0738) Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 737
Judiciary
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0379 /CH0597 (SB0547/CH0596) Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition Delegate Love 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 597
Environment and Transportation
2/14/2024 - 1:15 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0538 /CH0122 (SB0484) Land Use – Affordable Housing – Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) Speaker 3 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 122
Environment and Transportation
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
Education, Energy, and the Environment
HB0764 /CH0483 (SB1116) State Lottery Fund - Bus Rapid Transit Fund Distribution and Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facility Fund - Alterations Delegate Shetty 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 483
Appropriations
2/20/2024 - 12:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/26/2024 - 12:00 PM
HB0836 (SB0681) Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Workgroup (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024) Delegate Edelson 2 2 In the Senate - Special Order until later today (Senator King) Adopted
Appropriations
3/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Finance
Budget and Taxation
HB1001 Motor Vehicles - Automated Enforcement Programs - Privacy Protections Delegate Love 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/29/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/27/2024 - 1:00 PM
HB1126 (SB0785) Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure Delegate Buckel 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Judiciary
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
HB1446 (SB1060) Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024) Delegate Stein 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/07/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0131 Transportation - Consolidated Transportation Program - Categorization and Equitable Distribution of Projects Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/18 at 12:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
1/18/2024 - 12:00 PM
SB0287 /CH0738 (HB0172/CH0737) Department of State Police - Professional Occupations - Application Process Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 738
Judicial Proceedings
2/06/2024 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0484 (HB0538/CH0122) Land Use - Affordable Housing - Zoning Density and Permitting (Housing Expansion and Affordability Act of 2024) President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 9:00 a.m.
Education, Energy, and the Environment
3/01/2024 - 9:00 AM
SB0547 /CH0596 (HB0379/CH0597) Wildlife - Traveling Animal Acts - Prohibition Senator Elfreth 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 596
Education, Energy, and the Environment
2/13/2024 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
3/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0681 (HB0836) Major Highway Capacity Expansion Projects - Impact Assessments and Mitigation Plans (Transportation and Climate Alignment Act of 2024) Senator Lam 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Finance
2/28/2024 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0785 (HB1126) Public Nuisance - Common Carriers - Damage to Public Infrastructure Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judicial Proceedings
2/20/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB0966 /CH0722 Prior Authorizations of State Debt - Alterations Senator Zucker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 722
Budget and Taxation
2/21/2024 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
SB1060 (HB1446) Railroads - Safety Requirements (Maryland Railway Safety Act of 2024) Senator Ellis 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/14/2024 - 1:00 PM
SB1070 Financial Institutions - Heritage Areas - Canal Place Senator McKay 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 5/16/2024 1:37 PM
Click to return on the top page