Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Radio

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0331 /CH0638
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1384
Title
Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Qi
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0673 /CH0203
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary
Sponsor
Senator Bailey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0331 /CH0638 Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures Delegate Boteler 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 638
Environment and Transportation
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1384 Economic Development - Industry 4.0 Technology Grant Program (Maryland Manufacturing Innovation Act of 2022) Delegate Qi 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Ways and Means
3/09/2022 - 2:30 PM
Rules
SB0673 /CH0203 Natural Resources Police Force - Employees - Authority of Secretary Senator Bailey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 203
Judicial Proceedings
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/29/2022 - 3:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:14 PM
Click to return on the top page