Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Radio

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0391 /CH0610 (SB0716/CH0611)
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Delegate Hartman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0663
Title
Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures
Sponsor
Delegate Boteler
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0787/CH0669)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0097
Title
Purple Line Marketing Act
Sponsor
Senator Rosapepe
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0716 /CH0611 (HB0391/CH0610)
Title
Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere
Sponsor
Senator Carozza
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 /CH0669 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0391 /CH0610 (SB0716/CH0611) Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Delegate Hartman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 610
Environment and Transportation
1/15/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0663 Local Government - Regulation of Amateur Radio Station Antenna Structures Delegate Boteler 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 (SB0787/CH0669) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0097 Purple Line Marketing Act Senator Rosapepe 2 2 Vetoed by the Governor (Policy)
Finance
1/27/2021 - 1:00 PM
Appropriations
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0716 /CH0611 (HB0391/CH0610) Solid Waste Management – Prohibition on Releasing a Balloon Into the Atmosphere Senator Carozza 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 611
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/24/2021 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
4/07/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0787 /CH0669 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 8:17 AM
Click to return on the top page