Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Racing

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0116 (SB0345)
Title
Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
Sponsor
Delegate Love
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0339 (SB0297)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Delegate Kerr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Delegate Rogers
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0897 /CH0061
Title
Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities
Sponsor
Chair, Appropriations Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256)
Title
Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0297 (HB0339)
Title
Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations
Sponsor
Senator Young
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0345 (HB0116)
Title
Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities
Sponsor
Senator Jennings
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257)
Title
Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments
Sponsor
Senator Beidle
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0116 (SB0345) Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities Delegate Love 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/19/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0339 (SB0297) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Delegate Kerr 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0718 /CH0603 (SB0918) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Delegate Rogers 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 603
Ways and Means
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/24/2022 - 1:30 PM
HB0897 /CH0061 Economic Development - Sports Entertainment Facilities and Events, Prince George's County Blue Line Corridor Facilities, and Racing Facilities Chair, Appropriations Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 61
Appropriations
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/08/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB0942 /CH0257 (SB0792/CH0256) Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders and Sports Wagering Facilities - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 257
Ways and Means
2/23/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0297 (HB0339) Gaming - Sports Wagering Facilities - Locations Senator Young 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/02/2022 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0345 (HB0116) Agriculture - Right to Engage in Equine Activities Senator Jennings 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0792 /CH0256 (HB0942/CH0257) Horse Racing – Satellite Simulcast Betting Facilities and Permit Holders – Alterations Senator Guzzone 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 256
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0918 (HB0718/CH0603) Anne Arundel County - Local Development Council - Delegate Appointments Senator Beidle 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page