Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Vehicle Laws - Miscellaneous (R7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0063
Title
Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement
Sponsor
Delegate Healey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0094
Title
State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles
Sponsor
Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0426
Title
Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops
Sponsor
Delegate Rosenberg
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1081 /CH0584 (SB0750/CH0585)
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsor
Delegate Boyce
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0149
Title
Rental Vehicle Agreements - Disclosures - Spare Tires
Sponsor
Senator Kagan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0715
Title
Public Utilities - Transportation Network Operators - Age of Motor Vehicles
Sponsor
Senator Reilly
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584)
Title
Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0063 Vehicle Laws – Parking Enforcement Delegate Healey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0094 State Vehicle Fleet - Conversion to Zero-Emission Passenger Cars and Other Light-Duty Vehicles Delegate Fraser-Hidalgo 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/30 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/20/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0426 Vehicle Laws - Policies and Prohibition Against Discriminatory Traffic Stops Delegate Rosenberg 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Judiciary
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1081 /CH0584 (SB0750/CH0585) Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing Delegate Boyce 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 584
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
SB0149 Rental Vehicle Agreements - Disclosures - Spare Tires Senator Kagan 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 1/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
1/26/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0715 Public Utilities - Transportation Network Operators - Age of Motor Vehicles Senator Reilly 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Finance
3/01/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0750 /CH0585 (HB1081/CH0584) Baltimore City – Vehicle Laws – Towing Senator McCray 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 585
Judicial Proceedings
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:16 PM
Click to return on the top page