Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels

Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0189 /CH0049 (SB0187/CH0050)
Title
Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving
Sponsor
Chair, Judiciary Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0388
Title
Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Points Assessments
Sponsor
Delegate Roberson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0946
Title
Motor Vehicle Administration - Breathalyzer Technology - Uniform Standards
Sponsor
Delegate Wilson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1486 (SB0565)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Accidents - Required Testing for Impaired Driving (Mateo's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Allen
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0187 /CH0050 (HB0189/CH0049)
Title
Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving
Sponsor
Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee
5 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0565 (HB1486)
Title
Motor Vehicles - Accidents - Required Testing for Impaired Driving (Mateo's Law)
Sponsor
Senator Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0189 /CH0049 (SB0187/CH0050) Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving Chair, Judiciary Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 49
Judiciary
1/29/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
HB0388 Vehicle Laws - Drunk and Drugged Driving - Points Assessments Delegate Roberson 2 2 In the House - Returned Passed
Judiciary
2/05/2025 - 2:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/20/2025 - 1:00 PM
HB0946 Motor Vehicle Administration - Breathalyzer Technology - Uniform Standards Delegate Wilson 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Economic Matters
HB1486 (SB0565) Motor Vehicles - Accidents - Required Testing for Impaired Driving (Mateo's Law) Delegate Allen 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0187 /CH0050 (HB0189/CH0049) Drunk Driving - Commercial Driver's Licenses - Disqualification From Driving Chair, Judicial Proceedings Committee 5 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 50
Judicial Proceedings
1/14/2025 - 1:00 PM
Judiciary
SB0565 (HB1486) Motor Vehicles - Accidents - Required Testing for Impaired Driving (Mateo's Law) Senator Charles 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/07 at 10:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/07/2025 - 10:00 AM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 4/10/2025 3:46 PM
Click to return on the top page