Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Vehicle Laws - Drunk Driving (R3)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0675
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Prior Convictions - Conviction for the Drunk or Drugged Operation of a Vessel
Sponsor
Delegate Valentino-Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0749 (SB0672)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Delegate Atterbeary
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0926
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0927
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants (Danshaun's Law)
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0932
Title
Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers
Sponsor
Delegate Arikan
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1164
Title
Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0559
Title
Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants
Sponsor
Senator Ready
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0672 (HB0749)
Title
Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0675 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Prior Convictions - Conviction for the Drunk or Drugged Operation of a Vessel Delegate Valentino-Smith 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/10 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/10/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0749 (SB0672) Drunk Driving Offenses – Ignition Interlock System Program Delegate Atterbeary 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
2/24/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0926 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties (Josette's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0927 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants (Danshaun's Law) Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0932 Drugged Driving - Controlled Dangerous Substance Testing - Authorized Police Officers Delegate Arikan 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:30 p.m.
Judiciary
3/03/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1164 Criminal Law - Homicide by Vehicle or Vessel - Penalties Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Judiciary
SB0559 Drunk and Drugged Driving - Testing - Warrants Senator Ready 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/25 at 11:00 a.m.
Judicial Proceedings
2/25/2021 - 11:00 AM
SB0672 (HB0749) Drunk Driving Offenses - Ignition Interlock System Program Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Judicial Proceedings
2/23/2021 - 2:30 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 3/12/2021 2:37 PM
Click to return on the top page