Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Transportation - Highways (R1)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0410 (SB0400)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution
Sponsor
Speaker
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0813 /CH0216
Title
Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0925
Title
Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Parrott
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1022
Title
State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills
Sponsor
Delegate Crosby
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1024 (SB0584)
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsor
Delegate Forbes
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1032
Title
State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Charles
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1187 /CH0240 (SB0726)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Sponsor
Delegate Anderton
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1362 /CH0592 (SB0729/CH0593)
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsor
Delegate Prettyman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1419
Title
Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation
Sponsor
Delegate Barve
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1433 /CH0160
Title
State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway
Sponsor
Delegate Walker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1435 (SB0947)
Title
Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1443
Title
Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems on Interstate 83 - Use of Revenue From Fines
Sponsor
Delegate Bridges
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0400 (HB0410)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution
Sponsor
President
3 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0584 (HB1024)
Title
Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road)
Sponsor
Senator West
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0726 (HB1187/CH0240)
Title
Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592)
Title
Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153)
Title
State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022)
Sponsor
Senator Waldstreicher
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0946
Title
Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution
Sponsor
Senator Washington
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0947 (HB1435)
Title
Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0254 /CH0153 (SB0874/CH0154) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 153
Environment and Transportation
2/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
HB0410 (SB0400) Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution Speaker 3 2 In the House - Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0813 /CH0216 Montgomery County – Speed and School Bus Monitoring Systems MC 03–22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 216
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Judicial Proceedings
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0925 Traffic Control Signal Modernization Fund – Establishment Delegate Parrott 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
2/24/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1022 State Highway Administration - Route 5 Reconstruction Project at Great Mills Delegate Crosby 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1024 (SB0584) Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) Delegate Forbes 2 2 In the House - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Environment and Transportation
HB1032 State Highway Administration - Highway Cleanup - Records and Reporting Delegate Charles 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1187 /CH0240 (SB0726) Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution Delegate Anderton 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 240
Environment and Transportation
3/10/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1362 /CH0592 (SB0729/CH0593) Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification Delegate Prettyman 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 592
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1419 Highways - Proposed Expressway Expansion - Rail Evaluation Delegate Barve 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/11 at 2:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
HB1433 /CH0160 State Highways – Designations – Piscataway Highway Delegate Walker 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 160
Environment and Transportation
3/11/2022 - 2:00 PM
Finance
3/31/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1435 (SB0947) Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
HB1443 Baltimore City - Speed Monitoring Systems on Interstate 83 - Use of Revenue From Fines Delegate Bridges 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0400 (HB0410) Transportation – Highway User Revenue – Distribution President 3 2 In the Senate - Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
2/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0584 (HB1024) Task Force on Traffic Patterns and Infrastructure on MD Route 45 (York Road) Senator West 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0726 (HB1187/CH0240) Transportation – Highway User Revenues – Revenue and Distribution Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Rereferred to Environment and Transportation
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0729 /CH0593 (HB1362/CH0592) Baltimore City – Use of Highway User Revenues for Traffic Functions and Enforcement – Modification Senator McCray 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 593
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0874 /CH0154 (HB0254/CH0153) State Highway Administration - Pedestrian and Bicyclist Fatalities - Infrastructure Review (Vision Zero Implementation Act of 2022) Senator Waldstreicher 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 154
Finance
2/16/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0946 Transportation - Highway User Revenues - Distribution Senator Washington 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0947 (HB1435) Transportation - Electronic Toll Collection Backlog - Fee Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Budget and Taxation
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 6:17 PM
Click to return on the top page