Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Queen Anne's County

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0546 /CH0443 (SB0981)
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0555 (SB0340/CH0774)
Title
Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – License Applications
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342)
Title
Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Delegate Arentz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0633 (SB0933)
Title
Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership
Sponsor
Delegate Ghrist
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0797
Title
County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1217
Title
Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase
Sponsor
Delegate Mautz
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1243
Title
Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program
Sponsor
Delegate Howard
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0340 /CH0774 (HB0555)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444)
Title
Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094)
Title
Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0933 (HB0633)
Title
Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0981 (HB0546/CH0443)
Title
Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition
Sponsor
Senator Hershey
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0546 /CH0443 (SB0981) Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 443
Environment and Transportation
2/17/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0555 (SB0340/CH0774) Queen Anne’s County – Alcoholic Beverages – License Applications Delegate Arentz 2 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Economic Matters
2/21/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0556 /CH0444 (SB0342) Caroline County, Dorchester County, and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 444
Environment and Transportation
2/18/2022 - 11:00 AM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0586 /CH0094 (SB0489/CH0095) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Delegate Arentz 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 94
Environment and Transportation
2/25/2022 - 1:00 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
HB0633 (SB0933) Education - Accountability and Implementation Board - Membership Delegate Ghrist 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB0797 County Boards of Education - Student Membership - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/03 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/03/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1217 Natural Resources - Oyster Inspection and Severance Taxes - Increase Delegate Mautz 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1243 Public Health - Rural Nonemergency Medical Transportation Program Delegate Howard 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/07 at 2:00 p.m.
Health and Government Operations
3/07/2022 - 2:00 PM
SB0340 /CH0774 (HB0555) Queen Anne's County - Alcoholic Beverages - License Applications Senator Hershey 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 774
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/04/2022 - 1:00 PM
Economic Matters
SB0342 (HB0556/CH0444) Caroline County and Queen Anne's County - Natural Resources - Sunday Hunting Senator Hershey 2 2 In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/09/2022 - 1:00 PM
Rules and Executive Nominations
SB0489 /CH0095 (HB0586/CH0094) Queen Anne's County - Public Safety - Buildings Used for Agritourism Senator Hershey 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 95
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Environment and Transportation
SB0933 (HB0633) Education – Accountability and Implementation Board – Membership Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
SB0981 (HB0546/CH0443) Pedestrians - Kent Island Drawbridge - Fishing Prohibition Senator Hershey 2 2 In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Rules
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:31 PM
Click to return on the top page