Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0795 /CH0634 (SB0724/CH0635)
Title
Gross Receipts Tax on Short-Term Lease or Rental of Heavy Equipment - Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0842 /CH0604
Title
Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Calvert County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1209
Title
Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Live Performances
Sponsor
Delegate Amprey
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1340 /CH0283
Title
Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22
Sponsor
Montgomery County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1477 /CH0250
Title
Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal
Sponsor
Washington County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0663
Title
Washington County - Admissions and Amusement Tax Exemption - Arts and Entertainment Districts
Sponsor
Senator Corderman
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0724 /CH0635 (HB0795/CH0634)
Title
Gross Receipts Tax on Short–Term Lease or Rental of Heavy Equipment – Alterations
Sponsor
Senator King
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0795 /CH0634 (SB0724/CH0635) Gross Receipts Tax on Short-Term Lease or Rental of Heavy Equipment - Alterations Delegate Luedtke 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 634
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0842 /CH0604 Calvert County - Hotel Rental Tax - Distribution of Revenue Calvert County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 604
Ways and Means
2/22/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1209 Baltimore City - Admissions and Amusement Tax - Live Performances Delegate Amprey 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Ways and Means
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1340 /CH0283 Montgomery County - Economic Development - Business Improvement Districts MC 08-22 Montgomery County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 283
Environment and Transportation
3/08/2022 - 1:00 PM
Finance
3/29/2022 - 1:00 PM
HB1477 /CH0250 Washington County - Mobile Home Parks and Mobile Home Tax - Revisions and Repeal Washington County Delegation 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 250
Ways and Means
3/15/2022 - 1:00 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/30/2022 - 1:00 PM
SB0663 Washington County - Admissions and Amusement Tax Exemption - Arts and Entertainment Districts Senator Corderman 2 2 In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Budget and Taxation
SB0724 /CH0635 (HB0795/CH0634) Gross Receipts Tax on Short–Term Lease or Rental of Heavy Equipment – Alterations Senator King 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 635
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2022 - 2:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/7/2022 7:17 PM
Click to return on the top page