Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Miscellaneous - Local (Q8)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0528 /CH0589
Title
St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax
Sponsor
St. Mary's County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0901 /CH0518 (SB0529/CH0519)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Delegate Bartlett
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1285
Title
Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21
Sponsor
Howard County Delegation
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1301 /CH0208 (SB0789/CH0209)
Title
Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Delegate Smith
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0529 /CH0519 (HB0901/CH0518)
Title
Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue
Sponsor
Senator Elfreth
4 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208)
Title
Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation
Sponsor
Senator McCray
4 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0528 /CH0589 St. Mary’s County – Repeal of Impact Fee – Authorization of Building Excise Tax St. Mary's County Delegation 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 589
Environment and Transportation
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0901 /CH0518 (SB0529/CH0519) Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue Delegate Bartlett 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 518
Ways and Means
2/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1285 Howard County - Fee for Rental Housing Services - Established Ho. Co. 15-21 Howard County Delegation 4 2 In the Senate - Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Environment and Transportation
3/16/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
4/01/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1301 /CH0208 (SB0789/CH0209) Baltimore City – Visit Baltimore – Appropriation Calculation Delegate Smith 2 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208
Appropriations
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
SB0529 /CH0519 (HB0901/CH0518) Anne Arundel County - Hotel Tax Alterations - Distribution of Revenue Senator Elfreth 4 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 519
Budget and Taxation
2/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0789 /CH0209 (HB1301/CH0208) Baltimore City - Visit Baltimore - Appropriation Calculation Senator McCray 4 2 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 209
Budget and Taxation
2/24/2021 - 12:00 PM
Appropriations
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/11/2021 3:06 PM
Click to return on the top page