Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Taxes - Miscellaneous (Q7)

Legislation Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0105
Title
Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting
Sponsor
Delegate Henson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0165
Title
Maryland Estate Tax – Unified Credit
Sponsor
Delegate Wilkins
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0712 /CH0516 (SB0591/CH0517)
Title
Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
Sponsor
Delegate Jones, D.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916)
Title
Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Delegate Palakovich Carr
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB0884 /CH0413 (SB0678/CH0414)
Title
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
Sponsor
Delegate Buckel
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1079
Title
Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Activities That Promote Health and Physical Well-Being
Sponsor
Delegate Attar
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1086 /CH0575
Title
Maryland Tax Credit Evaluation Act – Alterations
Sponsor
Delegate Kaiser
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1101
Title
Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment
Sponsor
Delegate Acevero
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1200 (SB0787/CH0669)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction
Sponsor
Delegate Luedtke
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
HB1324 /CH0767 (SB0883/CH0768)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Delegate Young, P.
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0591 /CH0517 (HB0712/CH0516)
Title
Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance
Sponsor
Senator Zucker
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0678 /CH0414 (HB0884/CH0413)
Title
Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force
Sponsor
Senator Edwards
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0787 /CH0669 (HB1200)
Title
Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation
Sponsor
Senator Ferguson
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0883 /CH0768 (HB1324/CH0767)
Title
Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices
Sponsor
Senator Guzzone
2 2
Bill/Chapter (Cross/Chapter)
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515)
Title
Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections
Sponsor
Senator McCray
2 2
Bill/Chapter
(Cross/Chapter)
Title Sponsor Sponsorship Type Sort Chamber Sort Current Status Org Committees & Hearings Opp Committees & Hearings
HB0105 Department of Housing and Community Development – Community Development Administration – Compliance Monitoring Reporting Delegate Henson 2 2 In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Environment and Transportation
1/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
3/16/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB0165 Maryland Estate Tax – Unified Credit Delegate Wilkins 2 2 In the House - Hearing 1/21 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
1/21/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB0712 /CH0516 (SB0591/CH0517) Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance Delegate Jones, D. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 516
Ways and Means
2/11/2021 - 1:30 PM
Appropriations
Budget and Taxation
HB0804 /CH0515 (SB0916) Taxes – Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Delegate Palakovich Carr 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 515
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB0884 /CH0413 (SB0678/CH0414) Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force Delegate Buckel 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 413
Ways and Means
2/18/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
HB1079 Admissions and Amusement Tax - Exemption - Activities That Promote Health and Physical Well-Being Delegate Attar 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/23 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/23/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1086 /CH0575 Maryland Tax Credit Evaluation Act – Alterations Delegate Kaiser 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 575
Ways and Means
2/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
Budget and Taxation
3/25/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1101 Maryland People’s Fund – Establishment Delegate Acevero 2 2 In the House - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Appropriations
3/12/2021 - 1:00 PM
HB1200 (SB0787/CH0669) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues Tax - Exemption and Restriction Delegate Luedtke 2 2 In the House - Hearing 2/26 at 1:30 p.m.
Ways and Means
2/26/2021 - 1:30 PM
HB1324 /CH0767 (SB0883/CH0768) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Delegate Young, P. 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 767
Ways and Means
3/09/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
Budget and Taxation
SB0591 /CH0517 (HB0712/CH0516) Bureau of Revenue Estimates - Tax Incidence Study - Scope and Intergovernmental Assistance Senator Zucker 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 517
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Appropriations
SB0678 /CH0414 (HB0884/CH0413) Task Force on the Economic Future of Western Maryland - Extension of Report Deadline and Task Force Senator Edwards 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 414
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
SB0787 /CH0669 (HB1200) Digital Advertising Gross Revenues, Income, Sales and Use, and Tobacco Taxes - Alterations and Implementation Senator Ferguson 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 669
Budget and Taxation
2/17/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
3/25/2021 - 1:30 PM
SB0883 /CH0768 (HB1324/CH0767) Tobacco Tax and Sales and Use Tax - Out-of-State Sales of Premium Cigars and Pipe Tobacco and Tobacco Smoking Devices Senator Guzzone 2 2 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 768
Budget and Taxation
3/03/2021 - 1:00 PM
Finance
Ways and Means
3/30/2021 - 1:30 PM
Economic Matters
SB0916 (HB0804/CH0515) Taxes - Whistleblower Reward Program and Statute of Limitations for Tax Collections Senator McCray 2 2 In the House - Special Order until later this session (Delegate Luedtke) Adopted
Budget and Taxation
3/09/2021 - 1:00 PM
Ways and Means
Denotes enacted legislation
Last Updated: 6/15/2021 11:54 AM
Click to return on the top page